BETH SHMUEL SYNAGOGUE LIMITED

Charity number: 251044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £318.81k £362.73k £372.63k £635.17k £386.88k
Total expenditure £297.62k £279.95k £310.89k £1.32m £304.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £4.27k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £585.91k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £49.26k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £1.32m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £4.44k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £2.39k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £1.10m N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A