Trustees WYCLIFFE UK LIMITED

Charity number: 251233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Jules Steinegger Chair 13 June 2013
COLKINS MILL CHURCH
Received: On time
Rachel Louise Bradley Trustee 21 June 2023
None on record
Mary Jane Comont Trustee 21 June 2023
None on record
Folajimi Ayodele Adedoyin Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
James Turner Trustee 18 March 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT CHESHAM
Received: On time
Rebecca Helen Jean Benton Trustee 21 March 2018
None on record
Kevin Stewart Ashman Trustee 13 December 2017
INTERNATIONAL SERVICE FELLOWSHIP TRUST
Received: On time
OMF INTERNATIONAL (UK)
Received: On time
DR Ian Kenneth Kirby Trustee 15 December 2016
None on record
JANE MERYL SHOWELL-ROGERS Trustee 28 September 2011
GENDER AND RELIGIOUS FREEDOM
Recently registered
KENNETH MACANGUS MACKENZIE Trustee 01 December 1995
None on record