Linked charities PARDSHAW MONTHLY MEETING SOCIETY OF FRIENDS - EAGLESFIELD MEETING HOUSE AND BURIAL GROUND
Charity number: 251366
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 24 JANUARY 1891 AND SCHEMES OF 17/7/1970 AND 29/1/1981
Charitable objects
MAINTAINING, REPAIRING AND IMPROVING ANY MEETING HOUSE OR BURIAL GROUND OF THE SOCIETY OF FRIENDS IN THE AREA OF THE PARDSHAW MONTHLY MEETING
Area of benefit
PARDSHAW
Registration history
- 31 July 1967 : Standard registration
- 11 November 2022 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.