Trustees CIRENCESTER CIVIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 251381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole Boydell | Chair | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anita Kay | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Martin Green | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Mark Fearn | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAMES CECIL HARBORD | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Selwyn | Trustee | 28 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carole Suzanne Hudson | Trustee | 28 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Cooper | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.