Trustees THE BOGNOR REGIS FRIENDS OF THE HOSPITALS

Charity number: 252215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Megan Attfield Trustee 13 September 2021
None on record
LISA SAMPSON Trustee 14 May 2018
None on record
Stephen Sampson Trustee 07 November 2016
ARUNDEL FESTIVAL LTD
Received: On time
June Lawrence Trustee 05 July 2015
None on record
MAUREEN ANN MOORE Trustee 18 January 2013
None on record
RUSSELL BEACH Trustee
None on record
MARTIN JUDD Trustee
None on record
DR NICK ROWSE Trustee
None on record
LYNDA JENNIFER BUNKER Trustee
None on record
ANITA VIVIENNE STURDEY Trustee
None on record
MR CHARLIE BUNKER Trustee
None on record
MRS DEBBY BEACH Trustee
None on record
BRIAN DOUGLAS KNIGHT MBE Trustee
BOGNOR AND BERSTED UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
BOGNOR AND BERSTED UNITED EDUCATIONAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE JEAN CARR CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time