Trustees THE ARTHUR TOWNROW PENSIONS FUND
Charity number: 252256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Mick Brady | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark Carrick | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Perdita Mousley | Trustee | 21 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Keran Gladders | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Clough | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Newbury Milton Scott | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chesterfield borough council mayor | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Wilson | Trustee | 04 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Andrew nicholas Hay | Trustee | 12 December 2000 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth jean Froggatt | Trustee | 01 December 2000 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.