Accounts and annual returns THE HOLLY BUSH TAVERN
Charity number: 252308
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2011 | 16 May 2013 | 258 days late | |
Annual return | 31 October 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2010 | 16 May 2013 | 624 days late | |
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | 16 May 2013 | 989 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window