Accounts and annual returns SARAH MARIA WATERHOUSE

Charity number: 252475
Charity reporting is overdue by 1581 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 485 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 485 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 850 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 850 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1215 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1215 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1581 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1581 days