Trustees THE INSTITUTE FOR JEWISH POLICY RESEARCH
Charity number: 252626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Moss CBE | Chair |
|
||||||||||||||||||
Dr Efrat Shaoulian-Sopher | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Denise Nicole Joseph | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Mark Berman | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
FELICIA EPSTEIN | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
David Malcolm Ereira | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
William Stephen Benjamin | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Miles Jason Webber | Trustee | 17 April 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Professor Jonathan Edward Haskel CBE | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Elizabeth Crossick | Trustee | 29 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Lord Leigh of Hurley | Trustee | 29 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.