ST PETERS ITALIAN CATHOLIC CHURCH LITTLE SAFFRON HILL

Charity number: 252930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £531.57k £650.99k £650.99k £674.67k £444.26k
Total expenditure £443.90k £307.02k £307.02k £599.87k £801.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £67.69k
Income - Donations and legacies £207.00k £233.91k £233.91k £230.70k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £27.79k £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £44.00k £35.29k £0 £18.33k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £265.00k £381.79k £48 £1.87k N/A
Income - Other £15.00k £0 £389.24k £423.77k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £388.00k £150.09k £305.39k £596.57k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £56.00k £44.55k £1.63k £3.30k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £93.00k £0 £200.46k £546.91k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £112.38k £0 £0 N/A