Accounts and annual returns SAM AND BELLA SEBBA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 253351
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 August 2021 On time
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 May 2020 On time
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 September 2019 On time
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 August 2018 On time
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 September 2017 On time