Trustees THE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 253894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor David Paul Smith | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Hannah Mary Chisholm-Britt | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Gerarda Campbell | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nigel Mark Hooper | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dame Julia Mary Goodfellow | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Lisa Chakrabarti | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Augustin Amour | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Derry Mercer | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sheila Graham | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Luciane Vieira De Mello Rigden | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Frank Sargent | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michelle Joanne West | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.