ST SWITHUN'S CHURCH CHARITIES

Charity number: 254099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £16.51k £17.41k £18.16k £18.87k £16.14k
Total expenditure £16.25k £13.25k £16.00k £15.00k £13.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A