OXFORDSHIRE ANIMAL SANCTUARY SOCIETY

Charity number: 254642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £919.95k £1.41m £598.17k £642.92k £1.55m
Total expenditure £870.49k £1.06m £1.01m £973.39k £946.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £112.05k
Income - Donations and legacies £625.34k £1.10m £277.84k £289.16k £1.19m
Income - Other trading activities £249.51k £260.52k £250.82k £296.15k £290.40k
Income - Charitable activities £36.09k £31.20k £41.99k £39.26k £56.51k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.01k £21.42k £27.52k £18.36k £11.74k
Income - Other £0 £50 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £454.45k £960.60k £71.08k £110.73k £831.53k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £552.60k £652.77k £697.83k £772.69k £675.92k
Expenditure - Raising funds £164.59k £182.60k £169.74k £200.70k £270.61k
Expenditure - Governance £150.94k £213.16k £203.71k £173.31k £109.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £2.36k £8.72k £9.91k £9.73k £3.50k
Expenditure - Other £153.30k £221.88k £138.06k £0 £0