Financial history THE FRIENDS OF BATTERSEA PARISH CHURCH

Charity number: 254932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £989 £1.94k £2.20k £1.29k £918
Total expenditure £76 £0 £2.68k £4.23k £9.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A