Financial history THE JOSEPH AND LENA RANDALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 255035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £93.94k £99.89k £96.16k £87.82k £69.85k
Total expenditure £99.52k £95.98k £97.29k £78.73k £80.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A