Financial history THE HASLEMERE SOCIETY

Charity number: 255287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £4.08k £8.62k £2.88k £2.85k £3.99k
Total expenditure £3.33k £4.37k £6.21k £2.57k £4.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A