Accounts and annual returns THE MASON PORTER CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 255545
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 14 January 2020 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 14 January 2020 | 75 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 10 January 2019 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | 10 January 2019 | 255 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 10 January 2018 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | 10 January 2018 | 255 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window