Trustees NORTH WEST SURREY SYNAGOGUE
Charity number: 256232
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Jankel | Chair | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linnea Woolfson | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Goldenberg | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Asher | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Marcus | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ben Snapper | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Glicker | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna D'Olier | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Sheppard | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Val Levy | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sawyer | Trustee | 27 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN RALSTON | Trustee | 09 December 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.