Trustees WARWICK RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Charity number: 256447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Christine HONNORATY | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Kathleen Jane Gorman | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Cllr Paul Wightman | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Daniel Philip Browne | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Janette Dawn Eslick | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Amanda Jane Littlejohn | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Parminder Singh Birdi Cllr | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Diane Thompson | Trustee | 06 February 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Sarah Jane Hunt | Trustee | 18 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
John Anthony ATKINSON | Trustee | 08 July 2014 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Linda Jean Duckers | Trustee | 11 July 2012 |
|
|||||||||
Sheila Anne BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.