Governing document ST AUSTELL AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JUL 1970 AS AMENDED ON 21 JUL 2010 AS AMENDED ON 20 JUL 2011 AS AMENDED ON 27 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED ON 19 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED ON 17 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED ON 18 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED ON 03 AUG 2022 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUL 2023 as amended on 14 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ART OF DRAMA AND MUSICAL THEATRICAL PERFORMANCE FOR ALL IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.