Financial history ESTATE CHARITY OF LADY LEVESON'S OR THE FOXLEY CHARITY

Charity number: 256661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £76.47k £76.49k £76.71k £72.85k £87.20k
Total expenditure £76.63k £34.90k £62.00k £62.14k £42.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A