Governing document Peter Warlock Society
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 FEB 1970 AS AMENDED ON 01 JUN 1992 AS AMENDED ON 04 JUN 2005 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED ON 18 MAY 2019 as amended on 17 May 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY IS TO SPREAD KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE LIFE AND WORK OF PETER WARLOCK AMONG THE PUBLIC, AND TO ENCOURAGE PERFORMANCE OF HIS MUSIC, INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUCH GRANTS, PRIZES, SCHOLARSHIPS AND OTHER AWARDS TO MUSICIANS OR STUDENTS OF MUSIC AS THE COMMITTEE MAY IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.