CODY MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 257135
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Total gross income £44.96k £50.64k £50.64k £71.86k £62.89k
Total expenditure £44.98k £37.21k £37.21k £48.05k £45.55k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £1.00k N/A £2.00k