RAF ASSOCIATION, BRECON BRANCH

Charity number: 259118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.07k £1.49k £5.67k £19.90k £2.18k
Total expenditure £5.46k £275 £3.47k £5.22k £1.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A