Financial history THE ROYAL REGIMENT OF FUSILIERS AID SOCIETY

Charity number: 259229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £308.45k £331.21k £339.95k £321.72k £534.80k
Total expenditure £306.85k £360.21k £318.33k £300.33k £531.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £114.26k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.81k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £214.74k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £200.00k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £517.06k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.67k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £15.71k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £97.11k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.38k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0