Accounts and annual returns WEST WILTS MENCAP

Charity number: 259644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 08 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 08 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 30 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 13 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 13 July 2020 317 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required