Trustees THE LAKELAND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 259847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Ann Mees | Chair | 03 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Stephen Sharp | Trustee | 09 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Aldous | Trustee | 09 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hoben Burgess | Trustee | 03 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Davidson | Trustee | 03 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Dickinson | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Sutherland Sanford | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Patricia Hillmann | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charles Hunter Bulman | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Edward Willey | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.