THE MUSHROOM FUND

Charity number: 259954
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £37.70k £40.79k £38.66k £39.30k £36.72k
Total expenditure £32.20k £41.05k £39.88k £42.22k £32.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A