WIRKSWORTH CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 260609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £808 £1.07k £3.86k £250 £3.26k
Total expenditure £380 £513 £4.44k £248 £262
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A