Trustees ISLE OF WIGHT NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 260747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Peter Chatfield | Chair | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Gerald Thurbin | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Ticehurst | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hugh Smout | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Robert Cox | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Antony Paul Smith | Trustee | 14 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Charles Locke | Trustee | 14 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Richard Baldwin | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Bone | Trustee | 24 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Selena Bone | Trustee | 28 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alan David Blenkinsop | Trustee | 24 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anthony Howard Norman Roberts OBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TONI OLIVE GOODLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET CHRISTINE NELMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr COLIN RICHARD POPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS JACKIE HART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.