GREAT YARMOUTH MENCAP

Charity number: 260870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 07 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 21 March 2021 325 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 15 August 2019 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 09 August 2018 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required