Financial history THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF MANAGEMENT ACCOUNTANTS' BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 261114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £167.00k £212.00k £244.00k £183.00k £211.00k
Total expenditure £179.00k £205.00k £202.00k £126.00k £136.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A