FRIENDS OF THE FEDERATION OF ZIONIST YOUTH

Charity number: 261241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £15.45k £17.54k £8.48k £16.68k £13.12k
Total expenditure £19.72k £21.84k £2.41k £440 £4.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A