Financial history Britten Pears Arts

Charity number: 261383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.20m £10.13m £10.83m £12.64m £9.26m
Total expenditure £10.91m £11.26m £10.93m £11.95m £8.94m
Income from government contracts £0 £9.20k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.70m £1.50m £1.52m £73.00k £3.51m
Income - Donations and legacies £4.58m £3.07m £3.91m £3.83m £4.33m
Income - Other trading activities £4.97m £5.28m £5.20m £6.90m £3.37m
Income - Charitable activities £1.31m £1.54m £1.48m £1.53m £275.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £244.86k £236.53k £240.66k £279.00k £228.00k
Income - Other £91.89k £440 £0 £110.00k £1.05m
Income - Legacies £921.43k £207.02k £23.00k £808.00k £917.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.55m £5.84m £5.42m £6.16m £4.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.35m £5.42m £5.48m £383.00k £511.00k
Expenditure - Governance £21.94k £58.65k £65.54k £133.00k £60.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £34.94k £5.40m £4.27m