Governing document OPERA RARA
Charity number: 261403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 19TH JUNE 1970 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 2ND SEPTEMBER 1998, 1ST SEPTEMBER 1999 AND 16TH MAY 2001. as amended on 14 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ENCOURAGING AND PROMOTING THE STUDY OF OPERATIC ART AND IN PARTICULAR THE LESSER KNOWN WORKS OF OPERATIC ART.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.