Governing document WATERSIDE MUSICAL SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/07/1991 AS AMENDED ON 01/12/1972 AS AMENDED ON 01/12/1977 AS AMENDED ON 16/01/1987 AS AMENDED ON 28/01/2000 AS AMENDED ON 31/01/2004 AS AMENDED ON 28/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 27/01/2001 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 20 JAN 2023
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS, TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS; TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.