THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION RUSHDEN BRANCH (NO 519)

Charity number: 263072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.76k £8.41k £5.33k £6.55k £4.80k
Total expenditure £10.60k £7.68k £8.20k £7.05k £4.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A