Trustees OXMARKET CENTRE OF ARTS LIMITED

Charity number: 263367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mary Louise Goldsmith Trustee 13 May 2024
None on record
Robert Miall Trustee 13 May 2024
None on record
Tracie Patricia Bangert Trustee 22 January 2024
None on record
Stephen Smith Trustee 09 November 2023
None on record
Jonathan Bell Trustee 09 November 2023
None on record
Rebecca Harris Trustee 09 November 2023
ST CATHERINE OF SIENA CHURCH PRESERVATION TRUST
Recently registered
LOUISE MYLES Trustee 07 January 2021
None on record
Martyn Bell Trustee 26 November 2015
CHICHESTER DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Overdue by 134 days