Financial history THE ANGLO-NORSE SOCIETY IN LONDON

Charity number: 263933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £14.18k £25.53k £109.85k £12.23k £13.02k
Total expenditure £20.87k £24.65k £13.61k £15.94k £18.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A