Governing document BENEFACT TRUST LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH FEBRUARY 1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 26 JULY 2007 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION 16 JULY 2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08/07/2015 as amended on 15 Jul 2021 as amended on 03 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2. TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE FUNDS OF ANY CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS ASSOCIATIONS FUNDS OR OBJECTS AND TO CARRY OUT ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.