Financial history MICROBIOLOGY SOCIETY

Charity number: 264017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.78m £4.46m £6.25m £3.89m £4.10m
Total expenditure £4.76m £4.50m £5.42m £4.47m £4.19m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £60.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £22.00k £67.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.59m £4.16m £4.50m £3.78m £3.96m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £67.00k
Income - Investment £183.00k £206.00k £270.00k £88.00k £75.00k
Income - Other £0 £88.00k £1.48m £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £22.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.69m £4.43m £5.35m £4.40m £4.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £70.00k £72.00k £67.00k £72.00k £55.00k
Expenditure - Governance £67.00k £51.00k £83.00k £10.00k £37.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £70.00k £72.00k £67.00k £72.00k £55.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £60.00k