Accounts and annual returns BENSON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 264336
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 12 May 2020 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 20 August 2019 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2017 | 28 June 2018 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2017 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window