Trustees TAXI CHARITY FOR MILITARY VETERANS
Charity number: 264678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Heffernan | Chair | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hawes | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Philp | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Martin Carey | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS FRANCES CLARE LUCZYC WHYOWSKA | Trustee | 14 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
IAN CALVIN PARSONS | Trustee | 12 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR DICK GOODWIN | Trustee | 14 November 2006 |
|
|
||||
Paul Reginald Davis | Trustee | 01 November 1994 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE WILLIAM WARD | Trustee | 12 March 1994 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.