THE MAX REINHARDT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 264741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £29.25k £20.18k £21.49k £21.63k £18.30k
Total expenditure £53.15k £43.91k £58.27k £79.57k £50.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A