Trustees NORTHERN COUNTIES PONY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 264796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANICE ANITA FITCHETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mark Moncater | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Moncaster | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dickinson | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kim Neal | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sian Elphick | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Hall | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIE CRANE | Trustee | 12 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.