THE AVENUE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 264804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £6 £5.00k £2 £4 £3
Total expenditure £2.02k £1.73k £1.09k £1.26k £1.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A