THE ESTATE CHARITY OF ELIZABETH GRASVENOR AND ROBERT ROGERS

Charity number: 264889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 15 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 03 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 03 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 30 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 10 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 10 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 28 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 28 November 2016 On time Download