Trustees THE TOPSHAM SOCIETY
Charity number: 265073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor George Coleman | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS NEWMAN | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW NESBITT GRAHAM-CUMMING | Trustee | 29 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES JOHN DUTHIE | Trustee | 29 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jose Northey | Trustee | 23 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CHARLES BURLEY | Trustee | 14 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE RUTH JERMYN BURDICK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.