Financial history THE SUDBURY SOCIETY

Charity number: 265228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £13.85k £5.61k £4.03k £8.30k £2.35k
Total expenditure £7.78k £6.43k £3.35k £3.44k £5.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A